Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB695 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Analysis February 2, 2025
Fiscal Note February 2, 2025
Bill February 23, 2015

House Committee Report

Analysis February 2, 2025
Bill February 2, 2025

Engrossed

Fiscal Note February 2, 2025
Bill March 25, 2015

Senate Committee Report

Witness List February 2, 2025
Bill February 2, 2025

Enrolled

Analysis February 2, 2025
Bill May 18, 2015

Comm Sub

Bill May 8, 2015
Bill March 11, 2015