House | 05/11/2015 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/11/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/08/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3111 | |
House | 05/08/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/08/2015 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 05/08/2015 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/05/2015 | Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs | Journal Page: 2548 | |
House | 05/05/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2548 | |
Senate | 04/08/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 707 | |
House | 04/01/2015 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1365 | |
Senate | 04/01/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 696 | |
Senate | 04/01/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 667 | |
Senate | 04/01/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 667 | |
Senate | 04/01/2015 | Record vote | Journal Page: 667 | |
Senate | 04/01/2015 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 667 | |
Senate | 04/01/2015 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 666 | |
Senate | 04/01/2015 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 666 | |
Senate | 04/01/2015 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/25/2015 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/24/2015 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/17/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 452 | |
Senate | 03/16/2015 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/16/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 421 | |
Senate | 03/11/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/11/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/02/2015 | Referred to Vet Affairs & Military Installations | Journal Page: 303 | |
Senate | 03/02/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 303 | |
Senate | 02/24/2015 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/24/2015 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |