House
|
05/29/2015
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4774
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Vote reconsidered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Failed to receive affirmative vote in comm.
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Referred to Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 3105
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 3105
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2809
|
Senate
|
05/07/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1445
|
Senate
|
05/07/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1409
|
Senate
|
05/07/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1409
|
Senate
|
05/07/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1409
|
Senate
|
05/07/2015
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1408
|
Senate
|
05/07/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2015
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 1435
|
Senate
|
05/06/2015
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2015
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1325
|
Senate
|
05/05/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1325
|
Senate
|
05/05/2015
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1325
|
Senate
|
05/05/2015
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 1337
|
Senate
|
05/04/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2015
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 1125
|
Senate
|
04/21/2015
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 1027
|
Senate
|
04/20/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1001
|
Senate
|
04/15/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2015
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2015
|
Referred to Health & Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 304
|
Senate
|
03/02/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 304
|
Senate
|
02/24/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2015
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|