E
|
06/19/2015
|
Effective on 9/1/15
|
|
|
E
|
06/19/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3648
|
E
|
05/30/2015
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3592
|
House
|
05/30/2015
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5692
|
Senate
|
05/30/2015
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3503
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 3439
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5210
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2695
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 2694
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 2694
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2694
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1898
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4128
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#1298
|
Journal Page: 4127
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 4127
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4127
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3952
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#1254
|
Journal Page: 3952
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3952
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3951
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Amended
|
3-Clardy
|
Journal Page: 3951
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Amendment tabled
|
2-Nevrez
|
Journal Page: 3950
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Point of order overruled
|
Rule 11, Section 2 and Rule 11, Section 3; Article III, Section 30
|
Journal Page: 3948
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3947
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2015
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2015
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3547
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
Vote reconsidered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Failed to receive affirmative vote in comm.
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2015
|
Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
|
|
Journal Page: 2444
|
House
|
05/04/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2444
|
House
|
04/29/2015
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2110
|
Senate
|
04/28/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1202
|
Senate
|
04/28/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1143
|
Senate
|
04/28/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1143
|
Senate
|
04/28/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1143
|
Senate
|
04/28/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1143
|
Senate
|
04/28/2015
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1143
|
Senate
|
04/28/2015
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1142
|
Senate
|
04/27/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2015
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 1125
|
Senate
|
04/22/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1057
|
Senate
|
04/20/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2015
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2015
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 305
|
Senate
|
03/02/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 305
|
Senate
|
02/24/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2015
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|