LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2015 - 84th Regular
Senate
Bills
SB735
Compare Versions
TX
Texas Senate Bill SB735
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2015 - 84th Regular
Texas Senate Bill SB735
Compare Versions
SB735 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB735 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB735 Enrolled May 28, 2015
SB735 Comm Sub May 13, 2015
SB735 Engrossed April 28, 2015
SB735 Comm Sub April 22, 2015
SB735 Introduced February 24, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
SB735 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB735 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB735 Enrolled May 28, 2015
SB735 Comm Sub May 13, 2015
SB735 Engrossed April 28, 2015
SB735 Comm Sub April 22, 2015
SB735 Introduced February 24, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare