Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB735 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/22/2015

                    By: Fraser S.B. No. 735
 (In the Senate - Filed February 24, 2015; March 2, 2015,
 read first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs;
 April 22, 2015, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 2; April 22, 2015,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 735 By:  Ellis


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to discovery of evidence of the net worth of a defendant in
 connection with a claim for exemplary damages.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 41.001, Civil Practice and Remedies
 Code, is amended by adding Subdivision (7-a) to read as follows:
 (7-a)  "Net worth" means the total assets of a person
 minus the total liabilities of the person on a date determined
 appropriate by the trial court.
 SECTION 2.  Chapter 41, Civil Practice and Remedies Code, is
 amended by adding Section 41.0115 to read as follows:
 Sec. 41.0115.  DISCOVERY OF EVIDENCE OF NET WORTH FOR
 EXEMPLARY DAMAGES CLAIM. (a)  On the motion of a party and after
 notice and a hearing, a trial court may authorize discovery of
 evidence of a defendant's net worth if the court finds in a written
 order that the claimant has demonstrated a substantial likelihood
 of success on the merits of a claim for exemplary damages. Evidence
 submitted by a party to the court in support of or in opposition to a
 motion made under this subsection may be in the form of an affidavit
 or a response to discovery.
 (b)  If a trial court authorizes discovery under Subsection
 (a), the court's order may only authorize use of the least
 burdensome method available to obtain the net worth evidence.
 (c)  When reviewing an order authorizing or denying
 discovery of net worth evidence under this section, the reviewing
 court may consider only the evidence submitted by the parties to the
 trial court in support of or in opposition to the motion described
 by Subsection (a).
 SECTION 3.  The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to an action filed on or after the effective date of this Act.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *