Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB735 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/28/2015

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    S.B. No. 735


 AN ACT
 relating to discovery of evidence of the net worth of a defendant in
 connection with a claim for exemplary damages.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 41.001, Civil Practice and Remedies
 Code, is amended by adding Subdivision (7-a) to read as follows:
 (7-a)  "Net worth" means the total assets of a person
 minus the total liabilities of the person on a date determined
 appropriate by the trial court.
 SECTION 2.  Chapter 41, Civil Practice and Remedies Code, is
 amended by adding Section 41.0115 to read as follows:
 Sec. 41.0115.  DISCOVERY OF EVIDENCE OF NET WORTH FOR
 EXEMPLARY DAMAGES CLAIM. (a)  On the motion of a party and after
 notice and a hearing, a trial court may authorize discovery of
 evidence of a defendant's net worth if the court finds in a written
 order that the claimant has demonstrated a substantial likelihood
 of success on the merits of a claim for exemplary damages. Evidence
 submitted by a party to the court in support of or in opposition to a
 motion made under this subsection may be in the form of an affidavit
 or a response to discovery.
 (b)  If a trial court authorizes discovery under Subsection
 (a), the court's order may only authorize use of the least
 burdensome method available to obtain the net worth evidence.
 (c)  When reviewing an order authorizing or denying
 discovery of net worth evidence under this section, the reviewing
 court may consider only the evidence submitted by the parties to the
 trial court in support of or in opposition to the motion described
 by Subsection (a).
 (d)  If a party requests net worth discovery under this
 section, the court shall presume that the requesting party has had
 adequate time for the discovery of facts relating to exemplary
 damages for purposes of allowing the party from whom net worth
 discovery is sought to move for summary judgment on the requesting
 party's claim for exemplary damages under Rule 166a(i), Texas Rules
 of Civil Procedure.
 SECTION 3.  The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to an action filed on or after the effective date of this Act.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 735 passed the Senate on
 April 28, 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 20, Nays 11; and that
 the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 28, 2015, by the
 following vote: Yeas 23, Nays 8.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 735 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 22, 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 93,
 Nays 44, one present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor