E
|
06/17/2015
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/17/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3647
|
E
|
05/22/2015
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 1946
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4214
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 1946
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4086
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1817
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 1817
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 1817
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1815
|
Senate
|
05/19/2015
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1680
|
House
|
05/18/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#1168
|
Journal Page: 3689
|
House
|
05/18/2015
|
Passed as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3689
|
House
|
05/18/2015
|
Amended
|
4-S. Turner
|
Journal Page: 3688
|
House
|
05/18/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3687
|
House
|
05/14/2015
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3415
|
House
|
05/14/2015
|
Amended
|
3-S. Turner
|
Journal Page: 3414
|
House
|
05/14/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3413
|
House
|
05/14/2015
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3111
|
House
|
05/06/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2015
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2650
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
|
|
Journal Page: 2262
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2262
|
House
|
04/23/2015
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1943
|
Senate
|
04/23/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1127
|
Senate
|
04/23/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1086
|
Senate
|
04/23/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1086
|
Senate
|
04/23/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1086
|
Senate
|
04/23/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1086
|
Senate
|
04/23/2015
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1085
|
Senate
|
04/23/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1085
|
Senate
|
04/23/2015
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1085
|
Senate
|
04/22/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2015
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 1055
|
Senate
|
04/21/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1029
|
Senate
|
04/14/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2015
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2015
|
Referred to Criminal Justice
|
|
Journal Page: 306
|
Senate
|
03/02/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 306
|
Senate
|
02/24/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2015
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|