LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2015 - 84th Regular
Senate
Bills
SB746
Compare Versions
TX
Texas Senate Bill SB746
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2015 - 84th Regular
Texas Senate Bill SB746
Compare Versions
SB746 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB746 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB746 Enrolled May 21, 2015
SB746 Comm Sub May 11, 2015
SB746 Engrossed April 23, 2015
SB746 Comm Sub April 21, 2015
SB746 Introduced February 24, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
SB746 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB746 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB746 Enrolled May 21, 2015
SB746 Comm Sub May 11, 2015
SB746 Engrossed April 23, 2015
SB746 Comm Sub April 21, 2015
SB746 Introduced February 24, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare