Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB750 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Taylor of Galveston S.B. No. 750
 (In the Senate - Filed February 24, 2015; March 2, 2015,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Education;
 April 23, 2015, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 10, Nays 0; April 23, 2015,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 750 By:  Taylor of Galveston


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a report made by the Texas Education Agency regarding
 the property and casualty insurance costs of school districts and
 open-enrollment charter schools.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter Z, Chapter 44, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 44.905 to read as follows:
 Sec. 44.905.  PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COSTS.
 (a)  Not later than December 1, 2016, the agency shall provide to
 the governor, the lieutenant governor, and the members of the
 legislature a report containing:
 (1)  the amount paid for property and casualty
 insurance per student in average daily attendance by each school
 district and open-enrollment charter school; and
 (2)  the statewide average amount paid by school
 districts and open-enrollment charter schools for property and
 casualty insurance per student in average daily attendance.
 (b)  This section expires September 1, 2017.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *