E
|
06/20/2015
|
Effective on 9/1/15
|
|
|
E
|
06/20/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3648
|
E
|
05/30/2015
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3592
|
House
|
05/30/2015
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5692
|
Senate
|
05/30/2015
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3503
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 3439
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5208
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2774
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 2774
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 2774
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2763
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1898
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4122
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#1294
|
Journal Page: 4121
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 4121
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4121
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3945
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Amended
|
2-Raymond
|
Journal Page: 3936
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3934
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2015
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2015
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3547
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Referred to Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 2262
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2262
|
House
|
04/08/2015
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1434
|
Senate
|
04/08/2015
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 707
|
Senate
|
04/07/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 709
|
Senate
|
04/07/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 680
|
Senate
|
04/07/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 680
|
Senate
|
04/07/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 680
|
Senate
|
04/07/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 680
|
Senate
|
04/07/2015
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 679
|
Senate
|
04/07/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 679
|
Senate
|
04/07/2015
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 679
|
Senate
|
04/07/2015
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Schwertner
|
Journal Page: 679
|
Senate
|
04/07/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 679
|
Senate
|
04/07/2015
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 679
|
Senate
|
04/01/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2015
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 654
|
Senate
|
03/30/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 639
|
Senate
|
03/25/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2015
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2015
|
Referred to Health & Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 307
|
Senate
|
03/02/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 307
|
Senate
|
02/25/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2015
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|