LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2015 - 84th Regular
Senate
Bills
SB760
Compare Versions
TX
Texas Senate Bill SB760
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2015 - 84th Regular
Texas Senate Bill SB760
Compare Versions
SB760 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB760 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB760 Enrolled May 29, 2015
SB760 Comm Sub May 14, 2015
SB760 Engrossed April 7, 2015
SB760 Comm Sub March 30, 2015
SB760 Introduced February 25, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
SB760 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB760 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB760 Enrolled May 29, 2015
SB760 Comm Sub May 14, 2015
SB760 Engrossed April 7, 2015
SB760 Comm Sub March 30, 2015
SB760 Introduced February 25, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare