Senate | 05/08/2015 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/06/2015 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/23/2015 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/23/2015 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/23/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1093 | |
Senate | 04/16/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/16/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/15/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/15/2015 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/15/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/15/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/02/2015 | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations | Journal Page: 307 | |
Senate | 03/02/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 307 | |
Senate | 02/25/2015 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/25/2015 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |