Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB772 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Hancock S.B. No. 772
 (In the Senate - Filed February 25, 2015; March 2, 2015,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Intergovernmental
 Relations; April 23, 2015, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 0; April 23, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to legal representation for certain emergency services
 districts.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter C, Chapter 775, Health and Safety
 Code, is amended by adding Section 775.0315 to read as follows:
 Sec. 775.0315.  LEGAL REPRESENTATION. (a)  This section
 applies only to a district located wholly in a county with a
 population of 1.8 million or more in which two or more cities with a
 population of 350,000 or more are located.
 (b)  A district may employ or contract with private legal
 counsel to represent the district on any legal matter.  If the
 district does not employ or contract with private legal counsel on a
 legal matter, the county attorney, district attorney, or criminal
 district attorney, as appropriate, with the duty to represent the
 county in civil matters shall represent the district.
 (c)  A district that receives legal services from a county
 attorney, district attorney, or criminal district attorney may
 employ additional private legal counsel on the board's
 determination that additional counsel is advisable.  A district
 that contracts or employs private legal counsel under Subsection
 (b) may request and receive additional legal services from the
 county attorney, district attorney, or criminal district attorney,
 as appropriate, with the duty to represent the county in civil
 matters on the board's determination that additional counsel is
 necessary.
 (d)  If the district receives legal services from a county
 attorney, district attorney, or criminal district attorney, the
 district shall contribute money to be credited to the county's
 general fund account for the county attorney, district attorney, or
 criminal district attorney, as appropriate, in amounts sufficient
 to pay all additional salaries and expenses incurred by that
 officer in performing the duties required by the district.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *