E
|
05/15/2015
|
Effective on 9/1/15
|
|
|
E
|
05/15/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 1626
|
E
|
05/05/2015
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 1340
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 2476
|
Senate
|
05/05/2015
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1313
|
Senate
|
05/04/2015
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 1340
|
Senate
|
05/04/2015
|
House passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1263
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2149
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2147
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#448
|
Journal Page: 2149
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2149
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2149
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2127
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2127
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Laid out in lieu of companion
|
HB 2327
|
Journal Page: 2127
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2268
|
House
|
04/29/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2015
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2015
|
Vote reconsidered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2015
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2015
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2015
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 1940
|
House
|
04/23/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1940
|
House
|
04/10/2015
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1494
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 789
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 714
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 714
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 714
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 714
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 714
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 714
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 714
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2015
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 639
|
Senate
|
03/24/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2015
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2015
|
Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
|
|
Journal Page: 308
|
Senate
|
03/02/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 308
|
Senate
|
02/25/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2015
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|