6 | 4 | | AN ACT |
---|
7 | 5 | | relating to studies on the rates of electric utilities. |
---|
8 | 6 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
9 | 7 | | SECTION 1. Section 36.210, Utilities Code, is amended by |
---|
10 | 8 | | amending Subsections (h) and (i) and adding Subsection (h-1) to |
---|
11 | 9 | | read as follows: |
---|
12 | 10 | | (h) The commission shall undertake a study and conduct a |
---|
13 | 11 | | report analyzing any periodic rate adjustment established under |
---|
14 | 12 | | this section. The study shall be available for the legislature's |
---|
15 | 13 | | review by January 31, 2019 [2017], so that the legislature may |
---|
16 | 14 | | properly be informed as to the need to continue the commission's |
---|
17 | 15 | | authority to allow periodic rate adjustments. The report shall |
---|
18 | 16 | | contain but shall not be limited to: |
---|
19 | 17 | | (1) an analysis of all periodic rate adjustments |
---|
20 | 18 | | approved by the commission; |
---|
21 | 19 | | (2) an analysis of the amounts in real dollars and |
---|
22 | 20 | | percentages of the approved amounts by the commission and the |
---|
23 | 21 | | effects on all classes of ratepayers; |
---|
24 | 22 | | (3) the costs savings, if any, realized by all parties |
---|
25 | 23 | | by utilizing periodic rate adjustment as opposed to ratemaking |
---|
26 | 24 | | proceedings; |
---|
27 | 25 | | (4) an analysis on distribution costs included in |
---|
28 | 26 | | periodic rate adjustments, and their appropriateness for inclusion |
---|
29 | 27 | | in periodic rate adjustments; and |
---|
30 | 28 | | (5) an analysis submitted by the office on the effects |
---|
31 | 29 | | of periodic rate adjustments. |
---|
32 | 30 | | (h-1) The commission shall conduct a study and make a report |
---|
33 | 31 | | analyzing alternative ratemaking mechanisms adopted by other |
---|
34 | 32 | | states and shall make recommendations regarding appropriate |
---|
35 | 33 | | reforms to the ratemaking process in this state. The commission |
---|
36 | 34 | | shall include in the report an analysis that demonstrates how the |
---|
37 | 35 | | commission's recommended reforms would improve the efficiency and |
---|
38 | 36 | | effectiveness of the oversight of electric utilities and ensure |
---|
39 | 37 | | that electric rates are just and reasonable, as required by this |
---|
40 | 38 | | chapter. The commission may retain an independent consultant, at |
---|
41 | 39 | | the expense of electric utilities, to conduct the study. The |
---|
42 | 40 | | commission shall provide the report to the legislature not later |
---|
43 | 41 | | than January 15, 2017. |
---|
44 | 42 | | (i) This section expires September [January] 1, 2019 |
---|
45 | 43 | | [2017]. |
---|
46 | 44 | | SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2015. |
---|
| 45 | + | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
| 46 | + | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
| 47 | + | I hereby certify that S.B. No. 774 passed the Senate on |
---|
| 48 | + | April 9, 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0. |
---|
| 49 | + | ______________________________ |
---|
| 50 | + | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
| 51 | + | I hereby certify that S.B. No. 774 passed the House on |
---|
| 52 | + | April 30, 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 136, Nays 3, one |
---|
| 53 | + | present not voting. |
---|
| 54 | + | ______________________________ |
---|
| 55 | + | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
| 56 | + | Approved: |
---|
| 57 | + | ______________________________ |
---|
| 58 | + | Date |
---|
| 59 | + | ______________________________ |
---|
| 60 | + | Governor |
---|