Senate | 04/09/2015 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/09/2015 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/09/2015 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 760 | |
Senate | 04/07/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/31/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/31/2015 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/31/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/31/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/03/2015 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 322 | |
Senate | 03/03/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 322 | |
Senate | 02/26/2015 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/26/2015 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |