Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB802 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Eltife S.B. No. 802
 (In the Senate - Filed February 26, 2015; March 3, 2015,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Business and Commerce;
 April 9, 2015, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; April 9, 2015,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 802 By:  Schwertner


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to consumption of alcoholic beverages in public
 entertainment facilities.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 108.82, Alcoholic Beverage Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 108.82.  ALCOHOLIC BEVERAGE CONSUMPTION IN [CERTAIN]
 PUBLIC ENTERTAINMENT FACILITIES.  (a)  This section applies only
 [with respect] to a public entertainment facility:
 (1)  that is a stadium, arena, or other permanent
 structure that is used for sporting events;
 (2)  relating to which an agreement approved by the
 administrator under Section 108.79 is in force[:
 [(A)     located in a county with a population of
 more than 1.6 million;
 [(B)  constructed not later than 1994; and
 [(C)  with a seating capacity of at least 45,000];
 and
 (3) [(2)]  for which all alcoholic beverage permits and
 licenses are held by a single holder [independent concessionaire].
 (b)  Notwithstanding Section 28.10, the [independent]
 concessionaire for a public entertainment facility described by
 Subsection (a) may allow a patron who possesses an alcoholic
 beverage to enter or leave a licensed or permitted premises within
 the facility if the alcoholic beverage:
 (1)  is in an open container, as defined by Section
 49.031, Penal Code;
 (2)  appears to be possessed for present consumption;
 (3)  remains within the confines of the facility,
 excluding a parking lot; and
 (4)  was purchased legally at a licensed or permitted
 premises within the facility.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *