E | 06/19/2015 | Effective immediately | ||
E | 06/19/2015 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 3648 | |
E | 05/30/2015 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 3592 | |
House | 05/30/2015 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 5692 | |
Senate | 05/30/2015 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 3503 | |
Senate | 05/28/2015 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 3439 | |
Senate | 05/28/2015 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 2666 | |
House | 05/27/2015 | Record vote | RV#1556 | Journal Page: 4815 |
House | 05/27/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 4815 | |
House | 05/27/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 4815 | |
House | 05/27/2015 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 4785 | |
House | 05/27/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 4785 | |
House | 05/27/2015 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/26/2015 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 05/24/2015 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/23/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/23/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 4468 | |
House | 05/20/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/20/2015 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 05/20/2015 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/30/2015 | Referred to Higher Education | Journal Page: 2262 | |
House | 04/30/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2262 | |
House | 03/31/2015 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1339 | |
Senate | 03/31/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 672 | |
Senate | 03/31/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 645 | |
Senate | 03/31/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 645 | |
Senate | 03/31/2015 | Record vote | Journal Page: 645 | |
Senate | 03/31/2015 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 645 | |
Senate | 03/31/2015 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 645 | |
Senate | 03/31/2015 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 645 | |
Senate | 03/31/2015 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 645 | |
Senate | 03/30/2015 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/18/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 500 | |
Senate | 03/17/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 452 | |
Senate | 03/16/2015 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/16/2015 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/16/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 421 | |
Senate | 03/11/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/11/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/03/2015 | Referred to Vet Affairs & Military Installations | Journal Page: 323 | |
Senate | 03/03/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 323 | |
Senate | 02/26/2015 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/26/2015 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |