E | 05/28/2015 | Effective on 9/1/15 | ||
E | 05/28/2015 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 3103 | |
E | 05/20/2015 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 1787 | |
House | 05/20/2015 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 3898 | |
Senate | 05/19/2015 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 1715 | |
Senate | 05/18/2015 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 1723 | |
Senate | 05/18/2015 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 1633 | |
House | 05/15/2015 | Record vote | RV#1119 | Journal Page: 3580 |
House | 05/15/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 3580 | |
House | 05/15/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3580 | |
House | 05/15/2015 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 3559 | |
House | 05/15/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3559 | |
House | 05/15/2015 | Laid out in lieu of companion | HB 2411 | Journal Page: 3559 |
House | 05/14/2015 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/14/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/14/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3675 | |
House | 05/14/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/14/2015 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 05/14/2015 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/27/2015 | Referred to Juvenile Justice & Family Issues | Journal Page: 2003 | |
House | 04/27/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2003 | |
House | 04/10/2015 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1494 | |
Senate | 04/09/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 789 | |
Senate | 04/09/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 715 | |
Senate | 04/09/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 715 | |
Senate | 04/09/2015 | Record vote | Journal Page: 715 | |
Senate | 04/09/2015 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 715 | |
Senate | 04/09/2015 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 715 | |
Senate | 04/09/2015 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 715 | |
Senate | 04/09/2015 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 715 | |
Senate | 04/09/2015 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/08/2015 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/01/2015 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/31/2015 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/31/2015 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/31/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 655 | |
Senate | 03/30/2015 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/30/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/30/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/03/2015 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 323 | |
Senate | 03/03/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 323 | |
Senate | 02/26/2015 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/26/2015 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |