House
|
05/25/2015
|
Postponed
|
7/4/15 10:00 AM
|
Journal Page: 4482
|
House
|
05/25/2015
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 4482
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Postponed
|
5/25/15 8:00 AM
|
Journal Page: 4174
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4174
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2015
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3675
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2015
|
Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
|
|
Journal Page: 2003
|
House
|
04/27/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2003
|
House
|
04/16/2015
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1596
|
Senate
|
04/15/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 953
|
Senate
|
04/15/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 830
|
Senate
|
04/15/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 830
|
Senate
|
04/15/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 830
|
Senate
|
04/15/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 830
|
Senate
|
04/15/2015
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 829
|
Senate
|
04/15/2015
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 829
|
Senate
|
04/15/2015
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Huffman
|
Journal Page: 829
|
Senate
|
04/15/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 829
|
Senate
|
04/15/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 829
|
Senate
|
04/15/2015
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 829
|
Senate
|
04/13/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2015
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 656
|
Senate
|
03/30/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2015
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2015
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 325
|
Senate
|
03/03/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 325
|
Senate
|
02/26/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2015
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|