E
|
06/15/2015
|
Effective on 9/1/15
|
|
|
E
|
06/15/2015
|
Filed without the Governor's signature
|
|
Journal Page: 3647
|
E
|
05/25/2015
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 2163
|
House
|
05/24/2015
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4467
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2004
|
House
|
05/23/2015
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4339
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 2026
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1938
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 1938
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 1938
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1937
|
Senate
|
05/19/2015
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1680
|
House
|
05/18/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3691
|
House
|
05/18/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#1170
|
Journal Page: 3691
|
House
|
05/18/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3691
|
House
|
05/18/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3690
|
House
|
05/14/2015
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 3465
|
House
|
05/14/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3465
|
House
|
05/14/2015
|
Laid out in lieu of companion
|
HB 2688
|
Journal Page: 3465
|
House
|
05/14/2015
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3675
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Referred to Urban Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 3105
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 3105
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2808
|
Senate
|
05/07/2015
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 1435
|
Senate
|
05/06/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1437
|
Senate
|
05/06/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1386
|
Senate
|
05/06/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1386
|
Senate
|
05/06/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1386
|
Senate
|
05/06/2015
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1386
|
Senate
|
05/06/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1141
|
Senate
|
04/28/2015
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1141
|
Senate
|
04/28/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1141
|
Senate
|
04/28/2015
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1141
|
Senate
|
04/28/2015
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Bettencourt
|
Journal Page: 1141
|
Senate
|
04/28/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1141
|
Senate
|
04/28/2015
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1140
|
Senate
|
04/27/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1093
|
Senate
|
04/16/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2015
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2015
|
Referred to Intergovernmental Relations
|
|
Journal Page: 339
|
Senate
|
03/04/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 339
|
Senate
|
02/27/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2015
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|