Senate | 04/22/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1055 | |
Senate | 04/20/2015 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/20/2015 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1002 | |
Senate | 04/15/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/08/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/08/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/08/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/18/2015 | No action taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/18/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/04/2015 | Referred to Transportation | Journal Page: 339 | |
Senate | 03/04/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 339 | |
Senate | 02/27/2015 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/27/2015 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |