E
|
05/28/2015
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
05/28/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3103
|
E
|
05/20/2015
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 1787
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 3898
|
Senate
|
05/19/2015
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1715
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 1723
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
House passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1633
|
House
|
05/15/2015
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3579
|
House
|
05/15/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#1119
|
Journal Page: 3579
|
House
|
05/15/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3579
|
House
|
05/15/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3579
|
House
|
05/15/2015
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 3554
|
House
|
05/15/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3554
|
House
|
05/15/2015
|
Laid out in lieu of companion
|
HB 1017
|
Journal Page: 3554
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2965
|
House
|
05/06/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2015
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2015
|
Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 2109
|
House
|
04/29/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2109
|
House
|
03/31/2015
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1339
|
Senate
|
03/31/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 672
|
Senate
|
03/31/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 652
|
Senate
|
03/31/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 652
|
Senate
|
03/31/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 652
|
Senate
|
03/31/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 651
|
Senate
|
03/31/2015
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 651
|
Senate
|
03/31/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 651
|
Senate
|
03/31/2015
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 651
|
Senate
|
03/31/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2015
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2015
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 573
|
Senate
|
03/23/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 550
|
Senate
|
03/18/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2015
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 453
|
Senate
|
03/11/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2015
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2015
|
Referred to Vet Affairs & Military Installations
|
|
Journal Page: 340
|
Senate
|
03/04/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 340
|
Senate
|
02/27/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2015
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|