E
|
06/19/2015
|
Effective on 9/1/15
|
|
|
E
|
06/19/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3648
|
E
|
06/01/2015
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3644
|
House
|
06/01/2015
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6045
|
Senate
|
06/01/2015
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3624
|
House
|
05/31/2015
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6022
|
Senate
|
05/30/2015
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 3622
|
Senate
|
05/30/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3503
|
Senate
|
05/30/2015
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 3503
|
Senate
|
05/30/2015
|
Senate adopts resolution to go outside bounds
|
SR 1050
|
Journal Page: 3503
|
Senate
|
05/30/2015
|
House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3495
|
House
|
05/30/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 5615
|
House
|
05/30/2015
|
House adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 5614
|
House
|
05/30/2015
|
House adopts resolution to go outside bounds
|
HR 3374
|
Journal Page: 5612
|
House
|
05/29/2015
|
Conf. Comm. Report distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2015
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
Journal Page: 3421
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2663
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
House grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2663
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 4934
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
House grants request for conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 4934
|
House
|
05/26/2015
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4762
|
House
|
05/26/2015
|
Senate requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4762
|
House
|
05/26/2015
|
Senate refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4762
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 2267
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Senate requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 2267
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Senate refuses to concur
|
|
Journal Page: 2267
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 2266
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2266
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1738
|
House
|
05/19/2015
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3801
|
House
|
05/19/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#1198
|
Journal Page: 3801
|
House
|
05/19/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3801
|
House
|
05/19/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3801
|
House
|
05/19/2015
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3794
|
House
|
05/19/2015
|
Amended
|
1-G. Bonnen
|
Journal Page: 3795
|
House
|
05/19/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3794
|
House
|
05/19/2015
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2015
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2015
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3547
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures
|
|
Journal Page: 2263
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2263
|
House
|
04/15/2015
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1580
|
Senate
|
04/14/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 927
|
Senate
|
04/14/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 800
|
Senate
|
04/14/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 800
|
Senate
|
04/14/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 800
|
Senate
|
04/14/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 800
|
Senate
|
04/14/2015
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 800
|
Senate
|
04/14/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 800
|
Senate
|
04/14/2015
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 800
|
Senate
|
04/14/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2015
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 695
|
Senate
|
03/30/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2015
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2015
|
Referred to Intergovernmental Relations
|
|
Journal Page: 341
|
Senate
|
03/04/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 341
|
Senate
|
03/02/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2015
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|