LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2015 - 84th Regular
Senate
Bills
SB866
Compare Versions
TX
Texas Senate Bill SB866
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2015 - 84th Regular
Texas Senate Bill SB866
Compare Versions
SB866 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB866 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB866 Enrolled May 30, 2015
SB866 Comm Sub May 13, 2015
SB866 Engrossed April 14, 2015
SB866 Comm Sub April 7, 2015
SB866 Introduced March 2, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
SB866 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB866 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB866 Enrolled May 30, 2015
SB866 Comm Sub May 13, 2015
SB866 Engrossed April 14, 2015
SB866 Comm Sub April 7, 2015
SB866 Introduced March 2, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare