Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB866 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/30/2015

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    S.B. No. 866


 AN ACT
 relating to the regulation of amusement redemption machine game
 rooms in certain counties.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 234.131(2), Local Government Code, as
 added by Chapter 1284 (H.B. 2123), Acts of the 83rd Legislature,
 Regular Session, 2013, is amended to read as follows:
 (2)  "Game room" means a for-profit business located in
 a building or place that contains six or more:
 (A)  amusement redemption machines; or
 (B)  electronic, electromechanical, or mechanical
 contrivances that, for consideration, afford a player the
 opportunity to obtain a prize or thing of value, the award of which
 is determined solely or partially by chance, regardless of whether
 the contrivance is designed, made, or adopted solely for bona fide
 amusement purposes.
 SECTION 2.  Section 234.132, Local Government Code, as added
 by Chapter 1284 (H.B. 2123), Acts of the 83rd Legislature, Regular
 Session, 2013, is amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 234.132.  APPLICABILITY.  This subchapter applies only
 to:
 (1)  a county that has [with] a population of less than
 25,000, [that] is adjacent to the Gulf of Mexico, and is within 50
 miles of an international border;
 (2)  a county that has a population of four million or
 more;
 (3)  a county that is adjacent to the Gulf of Mexico and
 to a county that has a population of four million or more; and
 (4)  a county located on the Texas-Mexico border that
 has a population of less than 300,000 and contains a municipality
 with a population of 200,000 or more.
 SECTION 3.  Sections 234.136(a) and (b), Local Government
 Code, as added by Chapter 1284 (H.B. 2123), Acts of the 83rd
 Legislature, Regular Session, 2013, are amended to read as follows:
 (a)  A peace officer or county employee may inspect a
 business in the county to determine the number of amusement
 redemption machines or machines described by Section 234.131(2)(B)
 subject to regulation under this subchapter that are located on the
 premises of the business.
 (b)  A peace officer or county employee may inspect any
 business in which six or more amusement redemption machines or
 machines described by Section 234.131(2)(B) are located to
 determine whether the business is in compliance with this
 subchapter or regulations adopted under this subchapter.
 SECTION 4.  Subchapter E, Chapter 234, Local Government
 Code, as added by Chapter 1377 (H.B. 1127), Acts of the 83rd
 Legislature, Regular Session, 2013, is repealed.
 SECTION 5.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 866 passed the Senate on
 April 14, 2015, by the following vote:  Yeas 30, Nays 1; May 26,
 2015, Senate refused to concur in House amendments and requested
 appointment of Conference Committee; May 27, 2015, House granted
 request of the Senate; May 30, 2015, Senate adopted Conference
 Committee Report by the following vote:  Yeas 30, Nays 1.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 866 passed the House, with
 amendments, on May 19, 2015, by the following vote:  Yeas 141,
 Nays 5, two present not voting; May 27, 2015, House granted request
 of the Senate for appointment of Conference Committee; May 30,
 2015, House adopted Conference Committee Report by the following
 vote:  Yeas 118, Nays 25, two present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor