E
|
06/17/2015
|
Effective on 9/1/15
|
|
|
E
|
06/17/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3647
|
E
|
05/27/2015
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 2660
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4807
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2413
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 2660
|
House
|
05/26/2015
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4761
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2263
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 2263
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 2263
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2263
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1783
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3857
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#1224
|
Journal Page: 3856
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3856
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3856
|
House
|
05/19/2015
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3819
|
House
|
05/19/2015
|
Amended
|
1-Geren
|
Journal Page: 3819
|
House
|
05/19/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3819
|
House
|
05/19/2015
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2015
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Transferred to Calendars Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3266
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Referred to Agriculture & Livestock
|
|
Journal Page: 2263
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2263
|
House
|
04/10/2015
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1495
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 789
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 716
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 716
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 716
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 716
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 716
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 716
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 716
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2015
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 656
|
Senate
|
03/26/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2015
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2015
|
Referred to Business & Commerce
|
|
Journal Page: 342
|
Senate
|
03/04/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 342
|
Senate
|
03/02/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2015
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|