LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2015 - 84th Regular
Senate
Bills
SB880
Compare Versions
TX
Texas Senate Bill SB880
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2015 - 84th Regular
Texas Senate Bill SB880
Compare Versions
SB880 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB880 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB880 Enrolled May 26, 2015
SB880 Comm Sub May 11, 2015
SB880 Engrossed April 9, 2015
SB880 Comm Sub March 31, 2015
SB880 Introduced March 2, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
SB880 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB880 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB880 Enrolled May 26, 2015
SB880 Comm Sub May 11, 2015
SB880 Engrossed April 9, 2015
SB880 Comm Sub March 31, 2015
SB880 Introduced March 2, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare