House | 04/30/2015 | Referred to Public Education | Journal Page: 2263 | |
House | 04/30/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2263 | |
House | 04/08/2015 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1435 | |
Senate | 04/07/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 709 | |
Senate | 04/07/2015 | Record vote | Journal Page: 690 | |
Senate | 04/07/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 690 | |
Senate | 04/07/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 690 | |
Senate | 04/07/2015 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 689 | |
Senate | 04/07/2015 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 689 | |
Senate | 04/07/2015 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 689 | |
Senate | 04/07/2015 | Amended | Journal Page: 689 | |
Senate | 04/07/2015 | Amendment(s) offered | FA5 Rodrguez | Journal Page: 688 |
Senate | 04/07/2015 | Amendment tabled | Journal Page: 688 | |
Senate | 04/07/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 686 | |
Senate | 04/07/2015 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 685 | |
Senate | 04/02/2015 | Corrected comm. report printed & distributed | ||
Senate | 04/01/2015 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/30/2015 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/30/2015 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 639 | |
Senate | 03/24/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/24/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/19/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/19/2015 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/19/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/19/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/09/2015 | Referred to Education | Journal Page: 350 | |
Senate | 03/09/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 350 | |
Senate | 03/03/2015 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/03/2015 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |