Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB905 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Hinojosa S.B. No. 905
 (In the Senate - Filed March 3, 2015; March 9, 2015, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Intergovernmental
 Relations; May 12, 2015, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 5, Nays 2;
 May 12, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 905 By:  Nichols


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the appointment of a county auditor in certain
 counties.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 84.002(a), Local Government Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (a)  Except as provided by Subsection (b) or Section 84.0035
 [In a county with a population of 10,200 or more], the district
 judges shall appoint a county auditor.
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter A, Chapter 84, Local Government Code,
 is amended by adding Section 84.0035 to read as follows:
 Sec. 84.0035.  PROCEDURE FOR APPOINTMENT IN CERTAIN
 COUNTIES. (a)  In a county with a population of more than 300,000
 but less than 800,000 that borders the Rio Grande, the district
 judges, one county commissioner, and the county judge shall hold a
 meeting for the purpose of appointing a county auditor.
 (b)  The commissioners court shall designate one of its
 county commissioners to attend the meeting to appoint the county
 auditor.
 (c)  For a county auditor to be appointed, a majority of the
 district judges, the designated county commissioner, and the county
 judge must be present at the meeting. A candidate for the office
 must receive at least a majority vote of the district judges and
 members of the commissioners court who are present and voting at the
 meeting.
 (d)  Each district judge may nominate any number of
 candidates for the office.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *