House | 05/24/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/23/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/23/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 4468 | |
House | 05/23/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/23/2015 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/23/2015 | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . | ||
House | 05/22/2015 | Referred to Transportation | Journal Page: 4213 | |
House | 05/22/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 4213 | |
House | 05/21/2015 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 4087 | |
Senate | 05/21/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1946 | |
Senate | 05/21/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 1795 | |
Senate | 05/21/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1795 | |
Senate | 05/21/2015 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1795 | |
Senate | 05/21/2015 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1795 | |
Senate | 05/21/2015 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1795 | |
Senate | 05/21/2015 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1795 | |
Senate | 05/21/2015 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1794 | |
Senate | 05/21/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1845 | |
Senate | 05/20/2015 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/18/2015 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/18/2015 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/18/2015 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1676 | |
Senate | 05/14/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/29/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/29/2015 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/29/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/29/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 01/26/2015 | Referred to Transportation | Journal Page: 96 | |
Senate | 01/26/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 96 | |
Senate | 11/10/2014 | Filed | ||
Senate | 11/10/2014 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |