E | 05/22/2015 | Effective immediately | ||
E | 05/22/2015 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 1947 | |
E | 05/12/2015 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 1547 | |
House | 05/12/2015 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 3262 | |
Senate | 05/12/2015 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 1537 | |
Senate | 05/11/2015 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 1547 | |
Senate | 05/11/2015 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 1469 | |
House | 05/08/2015 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2840 | |
House | 05/08/2015 | Record vote | RV#758 | Journal Page: 2840 |
House | 05/08/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 2840 | |
House | 05/08/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2840 | |
House | 05/08/2015 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 2820 | |
House | 05/08/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2820 | |
House | 05/08/2015 | Laid out in lieu of companion | HB 2402 | Journal Page: 2820 |
House | 04/29/2015 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/29/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/29/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2267 | |
House | 04/28/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/28/2015 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/28/2015 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/27/2015 | Referred to Higher Education | Journal Page: 2003 | |
House | 04/27/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2003 | |
House | 03/25/2015 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1031 | |
Senate | 03/25/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 639 | |
Senate | 03/25/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 592 | |
Senate | 03/25/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 592 | |
Senate | 03/25/2015 | Record vote | Journal Page: 592 | |
Senate | 03/25/2015 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 592 | |
Senate | 03/25/2015 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 591 | |
Senate | 03/25/2015 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 591 | |
Senate | 03/25/2015 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 591 | |
Senate | 03/25/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 615 | |
Senate | 03/24/2015 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/24/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 573 | |
Senate | 03/23/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 549 | |
Senate | 03/18/2015 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/18/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 502 | |
Senate | 03/18/2015 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/18/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/18/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/09/2015 | Referred to Higher Education | Journal Page: 355 | |
Senate | 03/09/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 355 | |
Senate | 03/04/2015 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/04/2015 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |