6 | 4 | | AN ACT |
---|
7 | 5 | | relating to a study and report by the Texas Higher Education |
---|
8 | 6 | | Coordinating Board on the feasibility of providing off-campus |
---|
9 | 7 | | employment positions through the Texas college work-study program. |
---|
10 | 8 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
11 | 9 | | SECTION 1. Subchapter E, Chapter 56, Education Code, is |
---|
12 | 10 | | amended by adding Section 56.081 to read as follows: |
---|
13 | 11 | | Sec. 56.081. STUDY ON FEASIBILITY OF PROVIDING OFF-CAMPUS |
---|
14 | 12 | | WORK-STUDY EMPLOYMENT. (a) In this section, "public junior |
---|
15 | 13 | | college" has the meaning assigned by Section 61.003. |
---|
16 | 14 | | (b) The Texas Higher Education Coordinating Board shall |
---|
17 | 15 | | conduct a study to examine the feasibility of providing employment |
---|
18 | 16 | | positions located off-campus through the Texas college work-study |
---|
19 | 17 | | program. |
---|
20 | 18 | | (c) The study must identify: |
---|
21 | 19 | | (1) best practices for developing partnerships with |
---|
22 | 20 | | employers to provide off-campus employment positions through the |
---|
23 | 21 | | work-study program, including best practices learned from other |
---|
24 | 22 | | apprenticeship, internship, or mentorship programs in this state or |
---|
25 | 23 | | from similar programs in other states; |
---|
26 | 24 | | (2) any careers or industries that are well-suited for |
---|
27 | 25 | | providing off-campus employment positions through the work-study |
---|
28 | 26 | | program; |
---|
29 | 27 | | (3) current barriers that public junior colleges face |
---|
30 | 28 | | in developing partnerships with employers to provide off-campus |
---|
31 | 29 | | employment positions through the work-study program, including any |
---|
32 | 30 | | staffing needs or limitations on the outreach capabilities of those |
---|
33 | 31 | | colleges; and |
---|
34 | 32 | | (4) any public junior colleges that demonstrate strong |
---|
35 | 33 | | potential for successful participation in a pilot program to |
---|
36 | 34 | | develop partnerships with employers to provide off-campus |
---|
37 | 35 | | employment positions through the work-study program. |
---|
38 | 36 | | (d) Not later than December 1, 2016, the coordinating board |
---|
39 | 37 | | shall submit to the governor, the lieutenant governor, the speaker |
---|
40 | 38 | | of the house of representatives, and the standing legislative |
---|
41 | 39 | | committees with primary jurisdiction over higher education a report |
---|
42 | 40 | | on the results of the study and any recommendations for legislative |
---|
43 | 41 | | or other action. |
---|
44 | 42 | | (e) This section expires September 1, 2017. |
---|
45 | 43 | | SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives |
---|
46 | 44 | | a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as |
---|
47 | 45 | | provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this |
---|
48 | 46 | | Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this |
---|
49 | 47 | | Act takes effect September 1, 2015. |
---|
| 48 | + | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
| 49 | + | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
| 50 | + | I hereby certify that S.B. No. 947 passed the Senate on |
---|
| 51 | + | March 25, 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 29, Nays 2. |
---|
| 52 | + | ______________________________ |
---|
| 53 | + | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
| 54 | + | I hereby certify that S.B. No. 947 passed the House on |
---|
| 55 | + | May 8, 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 136, Nays 6, two present |
---|
| 56 | + | not voting. |
---|
| 57 | + | ______________________________ |
---|
| 58 | + | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
| 59 | + | Approved: |
---|
| 60 | + | ______________________________ |
---|
| 61 | + | Date |
---|
| 62 | + | ______________________________ |
---|
| 63 | + | Governor |
---|