1 | 1 | | By: RodrÃguez S.B. No. 976 |
---|
2 | 2 | | (In the Senate - Filed March 5, 2015; March 10, 2015, read |
---|
3 | 3 | | first time and referred to Committee on Intergovernmental |
---|
4 | 4 | | Relations; April 29, 2015, reported adversely, with favorable |
---|
5 | 5 | | Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 7, Nays 0; |
---|
6 | 6 | | April 29, 2015, sent to printer.) |
---|
7 | 7 | | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
8 | 8 | | COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 976 By: Lucio |
---|
9 | 9 | | |
---|
10 | 10 | | |
---|
11 | 11 | | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED |
---|
12 | 12 | | AN ACT |
---|
13 | 13 | | relating to certain qualified residential rental assistance |
---|
14 | 14 | | projects financed by private activity bonds. |
---|
15 | 15 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
16 | 16 | | SECTION 1. Section 1372.002, Government Code, is amended by |
---|
17 | 17 | | adding Subsection (f) to read as follows: |
---|
18 | 18 | | (f) Notwithstanding Subsection (c), an applicant to which |
---|
19 | 19 | | this subsection applies may aggregate more than one qualified |
---|
20 | 20 | | residential rental project into a single, combined project as part |
---|
21 | 21 | | of the participation of the housing authority for the applicable |
---|
22 | 22 | | municipality in the Rental Assistance Demonstration program |
---|
23 | 23 | | administered by the United States Department of Housing and Urban |
---|
24 | 24 | | Development, as specified by the Consolidated and Further |
---|
25 | 25 | | Continuing Appropriations Act of 2012 (Pub. L. No. 112-55) and its |
---|
26 | 26 | | subsequent amendments, if the combined project is related to the |
---|
27 | 27 | | municipal housing authority's conversion of public housing units as |
---|
28 | 28 | | permitted under that program. |
---|
29 | 29 | | SECTION 2. Section 1372.006(a), Government Code, is amended |
---|
30 | 30 | | to read as follows: |
---|
31 | 31 | | (a) An application for a reservation under Subchapter B or a |
---|
32 | 32 | | carryforward designation under Subchapter C must be accompanied by |
---|
33 | 33 | | a nonrefundable fee in the amount of $500, except that: |
---|
34 | 34 | | (1) for projects that include multiple facilities |
---|
35 | 35 | | authorized under Section 1372.002(e), the application must be |
---|
36 | 36 | | accompanied by a nonrefundable fee in an amount of $500 for each |
---|
37 | 37 | | facility included in the application for the project; [and] |
---|
38 | 38 | | (2) for issuers of qualified residential rental |
---|
39 | 39 | | project bonds the application must be accompanied by a |
---|
40 | 40 | | nonrefundable fee of $5,000, of which the board shall retain $1,000 |
---|
41 | 41 | | to offset the costs of the private activity bond allocation program |
---|
42 | 42 | | and the administration of that program and of which the board shall |
---|
43 | 43 | | transfer $4,000 through an interagency agreement to the Texas |
---|
44 | 44 | | Department of Housing and Community Affairs for use in the |
---|
45 | 45 | | affordable housing research and information program as provided by |
---|
46 | 46 | | Section 2306.259; and |
---|
47 | 47 | | (3) for a combined project that includes multiple |
---|
48 | 48 | | qualified residential rental projects authorized under Section |
---|
49 | 49 | | 1372.002(f), the application must be accompanied by a nonrefundable |
---|
50 | 50 | | fee in an amount of $5,000 for each qualified residential rental |
---|
51 | 51 | | project included in the application for the combined project, the |
---|
52 | 52 | | total amount of which the board shall retain 20 percent to offset |
---|
53 | 53 | | the costs of the private activity bond allocation program and the |
---|
54 | 54 | | administration of that program and of which the board shall |
---|
55 | 55 | | transfer 80 percent through an interagency agreement to the Texas |
---|
56 | 56 | | Department of Housing and Community Affairs for use in the |
---|
57 | 57 | | affordable housing research and information program as provided by |
---|
58 | 58 | | Section 2306.259. |
---|
59 | 59 | | SECTION 3. The change in law made by this Act in amending |
---|
60 | 60 | | Chapter 1372, Government Code, applies only to a reservation of |
---|
61 | 61 | | state ceiling granted on or after January 1, 2015. |
---|
62 | 62 | | SECTION 4. This Act takes effect September 1, 2015. |
---|
63 | 63 | | * * * * * |
---|