Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB976 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Rodríguez S.B. No. 976
 (In the Senate - Filed March 5, 2015; March 10, 2015, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Intergovernmental
 Relations; April 29, 2015, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 0;
 April 29, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 976 By:  Lucio


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to certain qualified residential rental assistance
 projects financed by private activity bonds.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 1372.002, Government Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (f) to read as follows:
 (f)  Notwithstanding Subsection (c), an applicant to which
 this subsection applies may aggregate more than one qualified
 residential rental project into a single, combined project as part
 of the participation of the housing authority for the applicable
 municipality in the Rental Assistance Demonstration program
 administered by the United States Department of Housing and Urban
 Development, as specified by the Consolidated and Further
 Continuing Appropriations Act of 2012 (Pub. L. No. 112-55) and its
 subsequent amendments, if the combined project is related to the
 municipal housing authority's conversion of public housing units as
 permitted under that program.
 SECTION 2.  Section 1372.006(a), Government Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (a)  An application for a reservation under Subchapter B or a
 carryforward designation under Subchapter C must be accompanied by
 a nonrefundable fee in the amount of $500, except that:
 (1)  for projects that include multiple facilities
 authorized under Section 1372.002(e), the application must be
 accompanied by a nonrefundable fee in an amount of $500 for each
 facility included in the application for the project; [and]
 (2)  for issuers of qualified residential rental
 project bonds the application must be accompanied by a
 nonrefundable fee of $5,000, of which the board shall retain $1,000
 to offset the costs of the private activity bond allocation program
 and the administration of that program and of which the board shall
 transfer $4,000 through an interagency agreement to the Texas
 Department of Housing and Community Affairs for use in the
 affordable housing research and information program as provided by
 Section 2306.259; and
 (3)  for a combined project that includes multiple
 qualified residential rental projects authorized under Section
 1372.002(f), the application must be accompanied by a nonrefundable
 fee in an amount of $5,000 for each qualified residential rental
 project included in the application for the combined project, the
 total amount of which the board shall retain 20 percent to offset
 the costs of the private activity bond allocation program and the
 administration of that program and of which the board shall
 transfer 80 percent through an interagency agreement to the Texas
 Department of Housing and Community Affairs for use in the
 affordable housing research and information program as provided by
 Section 2306.259.
 SECTION 3.  The change in law made by this Act in amending
 Chapter 1372, Government Code, applies only to a reservation of
 state ceiling granted on or after January 1, 2015.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *