House | 05/11/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/11/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/09/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3112 | |
House | 05/05/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/05/2015 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/30/2015 | Referred to State & Federal Power & Responsibility, Select | Journal Page: 2264 | |
House | 04/14/2015 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1550 | |
Senate | 04/13/2015 | Adopted | Journal Page: 771 | |
Senate | 04/13/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 771 | |
Senate | 04/13/2015 | Record vote | Journal Page: 771 | |
Senate | 04/13/2015 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 771 | |
Senate | 04/13/2015 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/09/2015 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/07/2015 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/25/2015 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/25/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 616 | |
Senate | 03/23/2015 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/23/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/23/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/04/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 344 | |
Senate | 02/18/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 252 | |
Senate | 02/11/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 215 | |
Senate | 02/09/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 193 | |
Senate | 02/04/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 185 | |
Senate | 01/27/2015 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 139 | |
Senate | 01/27/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 139 | |
Senate | 11/17/2014 | Filed | ||
Senate | 11/17/2014 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |