Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR1 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Analysis February 1, 2025
Bill November 17, 2014

House Committee Report

Bill February 1, 2025

Engrossed

Bill April 13, 2015

Senate Committee Report

Witness List February 1, 2025
Bill February 1, 2025

Comm Sub

Bill May 11, 2015
Bill March 25, 2015