E | 03/13/2015 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 421 | |
E | 03/05/2015 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 358 | |
House | 03/05/2015 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 579 | |
Senate | 03/04/2015 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 334 | |
Senate | 03/03/2015 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 345 | |
Senate | 03/03/2015 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 318 | |
House | 03/02/2015 | Adopted | Journal Page: 477 | |
House | 03/02/2015 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 477 | |
House | 02/24/2015 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 438 | |
Senate | 02/23/2015 | Read & adopted | Journal Page: 269 | |
Senate | 02/18/2015 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/18/2015 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |