House | 05/21/2015 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/21/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/21/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 4217 | |
House | 05/20/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/20/2015 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 05/20/2015 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/20/2015 | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . | ||
House | 05/11/2015 | Referred to House Administration | Journal Page: 3107 | |
House | 04/16/2015 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1632 | |
Senate | 04/16/2015 | Record vote | Journal Page: 937 | |
Senate | 04/16/2015 | Adopted | Journal Page: 937 | |
Senate | 04/16/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 937 | |
Senate | 04/16/2015 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 937 | |
Senate | 04/16/2015 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/16/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 952 | |
Senate | 04/13/2015 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/09/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 758 | |
Senate | 04/09/2015 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/08/2015 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/08/2015 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/08/2015 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 709 | |
Senate | 04/07/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/07/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/18/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 501 | |
Senate | 03/17/2015 | Referred to Administration | Journal Page: 450 | |
Senate | 03/17/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 450 | |
Senate | 03/09/2015 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/09/2015 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |