E
|
06/09/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3645
|
E
|
05/21/2015
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 1850
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4082
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1809
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 1850
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
House passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1740
|
House
|
05/19/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3797
|
House
|
05/19/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#1196
|
Journal Page: 3797
|
House
|
05/19/2015
|
Adopted
|
|
Journal Page: 3797
|
House
|
05/19/2015
|
Laid before the House
|
|
Journal Page: 3797
|
House
|
05/19/2015
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2015
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3547
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2015
|
Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism
|
|
Journal Page: 2447
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2143
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1206
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Adopted
|
|
Journal Page: 1206
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1206
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1206
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2015
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1002
|
Senate
|
04/15/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2015
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2015
|
Referred to Vet Affairs & Military Installations
|
|
Journal Page: 592
|
Senate
|
03/25/2015
|
Rereferred to committee
|
|
Journal Page: 592
|
Senate
|
03/23/2015
|
Referred to Administration
|
|
Journal Page: 547
|
Senate
|
03/23/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 547
|
Senate
|
03/13/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2015
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|