Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR33 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-By: Rodríguez S.C.R. No. 33
2- (Blanco)
1+S.C.R. No. 33
32
43
54 SENATE CONCURRENT RESOLUTION
65 WHEREAS, On September 8, 1849, Major Jefferson Van Horne and
76 a contingent of United States Army troops arrived in the vicinity of
87 present-day El Paso to establish a post on the Rio Grande, the first
98 American military encampment in an area that has hosted United
109 States armed forces now for more than a century and a half; and
1110 WHEREAS, A native of Bucks County, Pennsylvania, Jefferson
1211 Van Horne was born to Dorothy Johns Marple Van Horne and General
1312 Isaac Van Horne, a veteran of the American Revolution; following
1413 the family tradition of military service, he graduated from the
1514 United States Military Academy at West Point in 1827 and upheld its
1615 motto of "Duty, Honor, Country" throughout his life; and
1716 WHEREAS, His early assignments included frontier duty at
1817 Jefferson Barracks in Missouri and a tour at Fort Smith, Arkansas;
1918 from 1846 to 1848, he served his country in the Mexican War, and his
2019 distinguished efforts earned him promotion to the rank of major;
2120 and
2221 WHEREAS, While on leave in his hometown of Zanesville, Ohio,
2322 Jefferson Van Horne met Mary Gilbert, and after exchanging romantic
2423 letters for two years, the couple were married on November 28, 1850;
2524 they had one son, Lewis Cass Van Horne; and
2625 WHEREAS, In May 1849, Major Van Horne was instructed to
2726 establish a military post on the north bank of the Rio Grande,
2827 opposite what is now Ciudad Juarez, for the purpose of protecting
2928 both settlers in the area and travelers bound for California from
3029 Indian attack; he departed Camp Salado, on the outskirts of San
3130 Antonio, on June 1, commanding regimental staff, six companies of
3231 the Third Infantry, and a howitzer battery; his party of nearly 260
3332 soldiers was accompanied by some 100 civilians who played a
3433 supporting role; and
3534 WHEREAS, With 275 wagons, the expedition represented the
3635 longest wagon train to embark westward across Texas; after 100 days
3736 and a 643-mile overland march, Major Van Horne and his men reached
3837 their destination on September 8, 1849; Major Van Horne
3938 subsequently quartered four companies at Coon's Rancho, where
4039 downtown El Paso now stands, and sent two companies to garrison the
4140 old Spanish presidio at San Elizario, 20 miles to the southeast; and
4241 WHEREAS, In September 1851, the War Department closed both
4342 the post at Coon's Rancho and the presidio and ordered Major Van
4443 Horne and most of his troops to Fort Fillmore, 40 miles north of El
4544 Paso, near Mesilla, New Mexico; Major Van Horne had recruiting duty
4645 from 1852 to 1854, and between 1855 and 1857 he served at Fort
4746 Stanton, New Mexico, and at the Post of Albuquerque; he died in
4847 Albuquerque on September 26, 1857; and
4948 WHEREAS, A new army post was established on the site of
5049 present-day El Paso in January 1854, and in March of that year it
5150 was named Fort Bliss after Lieutenant Colonel William Bliss, a
5251 career army officer and an accomplished scholar who was also the
5352 son-in-law of President Zachary Taylor; the fort acquired a
5453 permanent location in El Paso in 1893; and
5554 WHEREAS, The post that Major Jefferson Van Horne established
5655 at the site of present-day El Paso served to protect a vital route
5756 for a dynamic and burgeoning nation pushing westward and marked the
5857 beginning of a long and close association between the United States
5958 military and the people of El Paso, and it is indeed fitting that
6059 the anniversary of his arrival at the Pass of the North be
6160 commemorated; now, therefore, be it
6261 RESOLVED, That the 84th Legislature of the State of Texas
6362 hereby designate September 8 as Major Jefferson Van Horne Day in the
6463 State of Texas; and, be it further
6564 RESOLVED, That, in accordance with the provisions of Section
6665 391.004(d), Government Code, this designation remain in effect
6766 until the 10th anniversary of the date this resolution is finally
6867 passed by the legislature.
68+ ______________________________ ______________________________
69+ President of the Senate Speaker of the House
70+ I hereby certify that S.C.R. No. 33 was adopted by the Senate
71+ on April 30, 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
72+ ______________________________
73+ Secretary of the Senate
74+ I hereby certify that S.C.R. No. 33 was adopted by the House
75+ on May 19, 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 141, Nays 0, one
76+ present not voting.
77+ ______________________________
78+ Chief Clerk of the House
79+ Approved:
80+ ______________________________
81+ Date
82+ ______________________________
83+ Governor