House | 05/27/2015 | Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm. | Journal Page: 4802 | |
House | 05/27/2015 | Withdrawn from calendar | Journal Page: 4802 | |
House | 05/27/2015 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/26/2015 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 05/14/2015 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/14/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/14/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3675 | |
House | 05/12/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/12/2015 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 05/12/2015 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/12/2015 | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . | ||
House | 05/11/2015 | Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism | Journal Page: 3107 | |
House | 05/08/2015 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 2834 | |
Senate | 05/08/2015 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1439 | |
Senate | 05/08/2015 | Adopted | Journal Page: 1439 | |
Senate | 05/08/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1439 | |
Senate | 05/08/2015 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 1439 | |
Senate | 05/08/2015 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/04/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1300 | |
Senate | 04/29/2015 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/29/2015 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/29/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1201 | |
Senate | 04/28/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/28/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/08/2015 | Referred to Administration | Journal Page: 700 | |
Senate | 04/08/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 700 | |
Senate | 04/08/2015 | Permission to introduce | Journal Page: 700 | |
Senate | 04/07/2015 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |