Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR38 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Analysis February 2, 2025
Bill April 7, 2015

House Committee Report

Bill February 2, 2025

Engrossed

Bill May 8, 2015

Senate Committee Report

Bill February 2, 2025

Comm Sub

Bill May 14, 2015
Bill April 29, 2015