Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR40 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Analysis February 2, 2025
Bill April 13, 2015

House Committee Report

Bill February 2, 2025

Engrossed

Bill May 8, 2015

Senate Committee Report

Bill February 2, 2025

Enrolled

Bill May 27, 2015

Comm Sub

Bill May 21, 2015
Bill May 7, 2015