E | 06/17/2015 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 3647 | |
E | 05/29/2015 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 3440 | |
House | 05/29/2015 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 5564 | |
Senate | 05/28/2015 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 2862 | |
Senate | 05/27/2015 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 3102 | |
Senate | 05/27/2015 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 2487 | |
House | 05/27/2015 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 4834 | |
House | 05/27/2015 | Record vote | RV#1569 | Journal Page: 4833 |
House | 05/27/2015 | Adopted | Journal Page: 4833 | |
House | 05/27/2015 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 4833 | |
House | 05/26/2015 | Placed on Resolutions Calendar | ||
House | 05/24/2015 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/21/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/21/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/21/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 4217 | |
House | 05/19/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/19/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 05/12/2015 | No action taken in committee | ||
House | 05/12/2015 | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . | ||
House | 05/11/2015 | Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism | Journal Page: 3107 | |
House | 05/08/2015 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 2834 | |
Senate | 05/08/2015 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1439 | |
Senate | 05/08/2015 | Adopted | Journal Page: 1439 | |
Senate | 05/08/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1439 | |
Senate | 05/08/2015 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 1439 | |
Senate | 05/08/2015 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/07/2015 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/07/2015 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/07/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1437 | |
Senate | 05/06/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/06/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/29/2015 | Referred to Administration | Journal Page: 1196 | |
Senate | 04/29/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1196 | |
Senate | 04/29/2015 | Permission to introduce | Journal Page: 1195 | |
Senate | 04/27/2015 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |