E | 06/15/2015 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 3646 | |
E | 05/25/2015 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 2163 | |
House | 05/24/2015 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 4467 | |
Senate | 05/24/2015 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 2004 | |
Senate | 05/22/2015 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 2026 | |
Senate | 05/22/2015 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 1860 | |
House | 05/21/2015 | Adopted | Journal Page: 4081 | |
House | 05/21/2015 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 4081 | |
House | 05/21/2015 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/18/2015 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | ||
House | 05/04/2015 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | Journal Page: 2447 | |
House | 04/30/2015 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 2136 | |
Senate | 04/29/2015 | Read & adopted | Journal Page: 1200 | |
Senate | 04/28/2015 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |