Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR42 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/22/2015

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            S.C.R. No. 42


 SENATE CONCURRENT RESOLUTION
 WHEREAS, The Legislature of the State of Texas honors and
 commemorates the life of the Honorable Sam Wilson Russell, who died
 May 14, 2014, at the age of 68; and
 WHEREAS, Sam Russell was born on August 31, 1945, in Gilmer;
 he attended public schools in Mount Pleasant, and during high
 school, he served as a White House page under the guidance of
 Congressman Wright Patman; he went on to earn degrees from East
 Texas State University and the South Texas College of Law; and
 WHEREAS, He married one of his best friends from high school,
 Janet Sue Cox, in 1978; they raised two children together, Monica
 and Clay, and were blessed with two grandchildren, Tyler and Jack;
 and
 WHEREAS, Mr. Russell joined his father's law firm in Mount
 Pleasant in 1979; he was elected to the Texas House of
 Representatives in 1982 and served the people of Northeast Texas
 with distinction for nearly 10 years; he was an influential member
 of a number of committees and served as chair of the Criminal
 Jurisprudence Committee and as House majority leader; and
 WHEREAS, Mr. Russell left the legislature in 1992 to serve as
 legislative director for Governor Ann Richards; after leaving the
 governor's office, he worked as a governmental affairs director,
 primarily representing interests in the fields of housing and
 transportation; and
 WHEREAS, He returned to his hometown of Mount Pleasant in
 2005 and resumed the private practice of civil and criminal law; he
 went on to serve as Titus County judge from 2006 to 2010; and
 WHEREAS, Over the course of his distinguished career in
 public service, he received numerous honors; he was named
 Legislator of the Year by the Texas Transit Association, and he
 received a Distinguished Service Award from the Texas Chamber of
 Commerce; he was recognized by the Texas State Teachers Association
 and the Texas Elementary Principals and Supervisors Association for
 his commitment to public education; and
 WHEREAS, He was active in a number of civic and philanthropic
 organizations, including the Mount Pleasant Rotary Club, Temple
 Lodge 70 of the Ancient Free and Accepted Masons, the Mount
 Pleasant-Titus County Chamber of Commerce, and the Snow Hill
 Cemetery Association; and
 WHEREAS, A man of courage, strength, and integrity, he gave
 generously to others, and his wisdom and his enthusiasm for living
 each day to the fullest will not be forgotten; and
 WHEREAS, He was a loving and devoted husband, father, and
 grandfather, and he leaves behind memories that will be treasured
 forever by his family and countless friends; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the 84th Legislature of the State of Texas
 hereby extend sincere condolences to the bereaved family of Sam
 Wilson Russell; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That a copy of this resolution be prepared for his
 family as an expression of deepest sympathy from the Texas
 Legislature and that when the legislature adjourns this day, it do
 so in memory of Sam Wilson Russell.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.C.R. No. 42 was adopted by the Senate
 on April 29, 2015.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.C.R. No. 42 was adopted by the House
 on May 21, 2015.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor