E | 06/18/2015 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 3647 | |
E | 06/01/2015 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 3644 | |
House | 06/01/2015 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 6045 | |
Senate | 06/01/2015 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 3624 | |
Senate | 05/30/2015 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 3622 | |
Senate | 05/30/2015 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 3509 | |
House | 05/30/2015 | Adopted | Journal Page: 5594 | |
House | 05/30/2015 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 5594 | |
House | 05/30/2015 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/28/2015 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | ||
House | 05/27/2015 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | Journal Page: 4970 | |
House | 05/27/2015 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 4970 | |
Senate | 05/27/2015 | Read & adopted | Journal Page: 2659 | |
Senate | 05/26/2015 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |