E | 06/18/2015 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 3647 | |
E | 06/01/2015 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 3644 | |
House | 06/01/2015 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 6045 | |
Senate | 06/01/2015 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 3642 | |
Senate | 06/01/2015 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 3643 | |
Senate | 06/01/2015 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 3640 | |
House | 06/01/2015 | Record vote | RV#1832 | Journal Page: 6031 |
House | 06/01/2015 | Adopted | SB 968 | Journal Page: 6031 |
House | 06/01/2015 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 6031 | |
House | 05/31/2015 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 6022 | |
Senate | 05/30/2015 | Record vote | Journal Page: 3522 | |
Senate | 05/30/2015 | Adopted | SB 968 | Journal Page: 3522 |
Senate | 05/30/2015 | Read | Journal Page: 3522 | |
Senate | 05/30/2015 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 3522 | |
Senate | 05/27/2015 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |